MD HB508 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-27 - Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-27 - Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a purchaser in a foreclosure sale, within 60 days after the entry of a final and nonappealable order ratifying a sale in an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on residential property, to close on a transaction to purchase real property and record a deed transferring title or to record among specified land records the final order of ratification and specified information; and defining "residential property."
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Mortgage Foreclosure Property Values Protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-20 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments 820016/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-03 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-02 | First Reading Environmental Matters |