MD HB507 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a dealer in Baltimore County or Harford County to sell, barter, deliver, give away, show, or offer for sale a motorcycle or certificate of title for a motorcycle on Sunday.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore County and Harford County – Motorcycles – Sunday Sales

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-01SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-28HouseThird Reading Passed (137-1)
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {283399/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-11HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback