MD HB506 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that specified noncompete and conflict of interest provisions that restrict the ability of an employee to enter into employment with a new employer or to become self-employed in the same or similar business or trade are null and void as being against the public policy of the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (86-49) (Y: 86 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {683920/1 (Delegate West) Rejected (51-87) (Y: 51 N: 87 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24SenateHearing canceled
2017-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-27SenateFirst Reading Finance
2017-02-24HouseThird Reading Passed (86-49)
2017-02-22HouseSecond Reading Passed
2017-02-22HouseFloor Amendment {683920/1 (Delegate West) Rejected (51-87)
2017-02-21HouseSpecial Order until 2/22 (Delegate West) Adopted
2017-02-21HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2017-02-20HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2017-02-14HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback