MD HB502 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for the sale of electricity generated by specified solar energy equipment or specified residential wind energy equipment for use in residential property owned by an eligible customer-generator.
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Sale of Electricity Generated by Solar Energy and
Sponsors
Del. Kumar Barve [D] | Del. Jon Cardin [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. James Gilchrist [D] |
Del. Jolene Ivey [D] | Del. Aruna Miller [D] | Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-03-28 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-24 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2011-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2011-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading Ways and Means |