MD HB5 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a landlord to provide a residential tenant with a voter registration application and information regarding voter registration when the tenant takes possession of the residential property.
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Voter Registration
Sponsors
Del. Jazz Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2018-01-23 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-07-18 | House | Pre-filed |