MD HB498 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the salary of assistant sheriffs in Calvert County who were active duty deputy sheriffs immediately before appointment to be set by the County Commissioners of Calvert County; requiring the County Commissioners to include a certain cost of living adjustment in a certain assistant sheriff's salary under certain circumstances; prohibiting the County Commissioners from reducing a certain assistant sheriff's salary without cause; and authorizing the Sheriff to negotiate a certain assistant sheriff's salary.
Title
Calvert County - Salary of Assistant Sheriff
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-25 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Calvert County
County Commissioners
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
County Commissioners
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs