MD HB490 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that the State Board of Nursing appoint specified peer review committees; authorizing the Board to appoint peer advisory committees to provide the Board with expert advice related to the practice of nursing by advance practice nurses; providing that a member of a peer advisory committee is entitled to receive compensation, as determined by the Board, and reimbursement for specified expenses; altering the maximum amount of a specified civil fine the Board may impose; etc.
Title
Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Peer Review and Advisory Committees and Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {296686/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Health
Health Occupations
Licenses
Nurses
Penalties and Sentences
Reimbursement Rates
Review Boards
Salaries and Compensation
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Health
Health Occupations
Licenses
Nurses
Penalties and Sentences
Reimbursement Rates
Review Boards
Salaries and Compensation