MD HB49 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a jurisdiction that uses a pretrial risk scoring instrument to assist in determining the eligibility for pretrial release of an individual charged with a crime to have an independent validation study of the instrument conducted at least once every 5 years; making an independent validation study conducted in accordance with the Act for a certain instrument used in a certain pretrial services program eligible for funding from the Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure – Pretrial Release – Pretrial Risk Scoring Instruments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2020-02-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {302818/1 Adopted
2020-02-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2020-01-09HouseHearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-08-22HousePre-filed
2020-01-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

SB68 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Referred Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Procedure5103(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety41101(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety41102(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety41103(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety41104(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback