MD HB49 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that an award of attorney's fees in an action for breach of contract shall be in accordance with the terms of a written contract under specified circumstances; establishing that attorney's fees equal to 15% of a recovery in an action for breach of contract shall be presumed reasonable under specified circumstances; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Breach of Contract - Attorney's Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-01-22 | House | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2013-08-27 | House | Pre-filed |