MD HB489 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making it a misdemeanor to knowingly and willfully make specified threats against a deputy State's Attorney, an assistant State's Attorney, or an Assistant Public Defender; and imposing penalties.
Title
Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Expansion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-1) (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-1) (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-1) |
2013-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {942810/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2013-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-30 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Attorneys
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Harassment
Penalties and Sentences
State's Attorneys
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Harassment
Penalties and Sentences
State's Attorneys