MD HB487 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the termination provision of a specified provision of law relating to the definition of "small business" as used for the purposes of the Small Business Reserve Program.
Title
Small Business Reserve Program - Definition of Small Business - Repeal of Sunset Provision
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2014-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-26 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-25 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |