MD HB486 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain emergency personnel to equip certain privately owned motor vehicles with certain emergency lights for use only while at the scene of an accident or other emergency.
Title
Corporal William Kyle Ferrell Emergency Vehicle Safety Act
Sponsors
Del. Dan Cox [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | House | Reassigned to Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-24 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Accidents
Ambulances
Armed Forces
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Personal Property
Rescue Squads
Safety
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Ambulances
Armed Forces
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Personal Property
Rescue Squads
Safety
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 22 | 218 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |