MD HB486 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-10)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-18 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-18 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the amount of a property tax exemption for dwelling houses owned by specified blind individuals or surviving spouses of blind individuals from $15,000 of the assessed value of the dwelling to $30,000; etc.
Title
Property Tax - Exemption for Blind Individuals and Surviving Spouses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-14 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |