MD HB486 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, on or before October 1, 2012, the Department of the Environment to create a list that ranks best management practices relating to a Watershed Implementation Plan based on cost and expected pollution reduction value; authorizing the Department to include specified information in the list; requiring the Department to update the list annually; and requiring the Department to publish the list on the Department's Web site and to mail a hard copy of the list to each county.
Title
Environment - Watershed Implementation Plan - Ranking Best Management Practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-03 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-02 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Conservation
Counties
Electronic Government
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Pollution
Public Information
Publications
Water
Conservation
Counties
Electronic Government
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Pollution
Public Information
Publications
Water
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB0486.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb0486f.pdf |