MD HB485 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing in Harford County a provision of law stating that a condition of a common direct or indirect sharing between specified persons of profit from the sale of alcoholic beverages gives rise to a presumption of indirect ownership interest in an alcoholic beverages license.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Common Direct or Indirect Sharing of Profit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {433092/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-27 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Harford County
Interest
Leases and Rent
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Harford County
Interest
Leases and Rent
Retail Sales