MD HB483 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB967
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that certain previous convictions for drunk or drugged operation of a vehicle or vessel and grossly negligent manslaughter by vehicle or vessel under certain provisions of law constitute prior convictions for the purpose of determining certain enhanced subsequent offender penalties.
Title
Grossly Negligent or Drunk or Drugged Operation of Vehicle or Vessel - Prior Convictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552 |
2023-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2023-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-02-21 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-02-20 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2023-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-30 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB74 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
HB967 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
HB967 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Boats and Ships
Crimes and Punishments
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Manslaughter
Motor Vehicles
Negligence
Penalties and Sentences
Repeat Offenders
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Crimes and Punishments
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Manslaughter
Motor Vehicles
Negligence
Penalties and Sentences
Repeat Offenders
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 8 | 738 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |