MD HB483 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Comptroller, for the purpose of identifying homeowners who are eligible for but have failed to claim the homeowners' property tax credit, to identify individuals who did not file an income tax return for the 3 most recent taxable years and provide the State Department of Assessments and Taxation those individuals' contact information.
Title
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Identification of Eligible Homeowners
Sponsors
Del. Julian Ivey [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2022-01-27 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |