MD HB483 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding a specified evidentiary rule to render admissible a specified statement made by a specified child victim to a specified adult describing a specified offense.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims and Witnesses - Out of Court Statement of Child Victim
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {682916/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2017-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-27 | House | First Reading Judiciary |