MD HB482 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing a credit against the State income tax for a certain amount of donations to certain qualified permanent endowment funds at Bowie State University, Coppin State University, Morgan State University, or University of Maryland Eastern Shore; requiring certain taxpayers to add a certain deduction back to federal adjusted gross income to determine Maryland adjusted gross income; limiting the amount of tax credit certificates certified by the Comptroller to no more than $240,000; applying the Act to certain taxable years; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax Credits – Endowments of Maryland Historically Black Colleges and Universities and Film Production Activity – Establishment and Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 544
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {119231/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-15SenateHearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {305567/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-04HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0482&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0482f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0482t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0482e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_544_hb0482e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0482_30556701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0482_11923101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0482.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0482_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0443.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0482_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1297.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1528.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback