MD HB480 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB425
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-26 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-26 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the vendor to provide a purchaser under a land installment contract with the results of a title search for the property at or before the time the purchaser signs the contract; requiring the inclusion of certain notice, terms, and recitals in a land installment contract formed in the State; altering, from 40% to 20%, the percentage of the original cash price of a land installment contract that the purchaser must pay before the purchaser may demand a grant of the deed to the property to the purchaser; etc.
Title
Real Property - Land Installment Contracts - Requirements and Vendor Duties and Limitations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2024-02-20 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-19 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-22 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB425 (Carry Over) 2023-03-16 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
SB664 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-12 - Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
SB664 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-12 - Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Subjects
Contracts
Deeds
Disclosure
Interest
Land Records
Liens
Mortgages
Notices
Prices
Real Property
Signatures
Titles
Deeds
Disclosure
Interest
Land Records
Liens
Mortgages
Notices
Prices
Real Property
Signatures
Titles
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 10 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 10 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 10 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 10 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 10 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |