MD HB480 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of the Attorney General to establish a consumer affairs satellite office located in Prince George's County; providing for the purpose of establishing a consumer affairs satellite office; requiring the consumer affairs satellite office to provide consumers with specified resources; requiring the Office of the Attorney General to give priority to a specified site when determining the location of the consumer affairs satellite office; etc.
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Establishment of a Consumer Affairs Satellite Office in Prince George's County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-20) (Y: 112 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-20) (Y: 112 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301 |
2014-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (112-20) |
2014-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {616785/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Attorney General
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Prince George's County
Public Buildings and Facilities
Reports
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Prince George's County
Public Buildings and Facilities
Reports