MD HB480 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-01 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-01 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a law enforcement agency to make a specified request to a specified State's Attorney to have a specified unexecuted warrant, summons, or other criminal process invalidated and destroyed under specified circumstances; authorizing the State's Attorney to petition a specified administrative judge for the invalidation and destruction of a specified unexecuted warrant, summons, or other criminal process; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Unexecuted Warrant, Summons, or Other Criminal Process -
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments 158572/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-04-03 | Delegates Vallario, Carter, and Smigiel | |
2012-04-03 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-04-03 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2012-04-03 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (123-7) | |
2012-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments 352510/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-02 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Arrests
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Judges
Law Enforcement
Petitions
Search and Seizure
State's Attorneys
Summonses
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Judges
Law Enforcement
Petitions
Search and Seizure
State's Attorneys
Summonses