MD HB48 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that certain provisions of law relating to the authority of public bodies to meet in closed session do not apply to the Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics; providing that the requirement that an advisory body delete certain information before an advisory opinion can be made public does not apply to the Joint Committee; repealing certain provisions of law requiring that certain matters before the Joint Committee remain confidential except under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics - Confidentiality of Activities - Repeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-01-25 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-11-02 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Ethics
Privacy
Public Information
State Government - General Assembly
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Ethics
Privacy
Public Information
State Government - General Assembly
State Government - Regulations and Procedures