MD HB478 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from committing a specified crime of violence when the person knows or reasonably should know that a minor is present in a residence; establishing specified circumstances under which a minor is present; establishing an enhanced penalty not exceeding 5 years for a violation of the Act; authorizing a court to impose an enhanced penalty if the State's Attorney provides a specified written notice to the defendant and if specified elements have been proven beyond a reasonable doubt; etc.
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2013-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments {152214/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2013-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-30 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Abduction
Arson
Assault
Burglary
Child Abuse and Neglect
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Indictments
Manslaughter
Minors
Murder
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Robbery
Sexual Offenses
State's Attorneys
Violence
Arson
Assault
Burglary
Child Abuse and Neglect
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Indictments
Manslaughter
Minors
Murder
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Robbery
Sexual Offenses
State's Attorneys
Violence