MD HB477 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund is to protect and restore State-owned lakes; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to develop a specified budget; requiring any interest earning of the Fund be credited to the Fund; requiring the Department, in coordination with local governments, organizations, and citizens, to develop an annual work plan that prioritizes and details projects that will receive funding from the Fund; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Protection and Restoration of State-Owned Lakes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404 |
2017-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2017-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-27 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |