MD HB477 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum total amount of research and development tax credits that the Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce may approve; and applying the Act to all Maryland research and development tax credits certified after December 15, 2015.
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts
Sponsors
Del. Jay Walker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-02-16 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |