MD HB477 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defining "convicted of a crime of violence" and "convicted of a disqualifying crime" to include probation before judgment for crimes of violence for the purpose of specified provisions of law that limit a person's right to possess a firearm or obtain a regulated firearm dealer's license based on prior convictions; and providing that the definitions of "convicted of a crime of violence" and "convicted of a disqualifying crime" do not include probation before judgment for assault in the second degree.
Title
Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before Judgment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-05 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2013-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 12:00 p.m. |
2013-02-26 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-30 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Abduction
Arson
Assault
Burglary
Crimes and Punishments
Dealers
Guns
Licenses
Manslaughter
Murder
Parole and Probation
Public Safety
Robbery
Sexual Offenses
Violence
Weapons
Arson
Assault
Burglary
Crimes and Punishments
Dealers
Guns
Licenses
Manslaughter
Murder
Parole and Probation
Public Safety
Robbery
Sexual Offenses
Violence
Weapons