MD HB475 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a public school employer and an employee organization to use an alternative procedure regarding the renegotiation of allocated funds under specified circumstances; providing that, in connection with the Public School Labor Relations Board's administration of specified subtitles, references to written communications include electronic communications, time limits may be extended for good cause, and venues for judicial proceedings involving Board action shall be in a specified county; etc.
Title
Public School Labor Relations - Renegotiation Procedures and Board Administration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-39) (Y: 95 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-39) |
2013-03-25 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-25 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-25 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2013-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-30 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Education - Miscellaneous
Public Schools
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Unions
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Education - Miscellaneous
Public Schools
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Unions