MD HB472 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from using glyphosate in the State on or after October 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture - Use of Glyphosate - Prohibition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-15HouseWithdrawn by Sponsor
2021-01-19HouseHearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-15HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Agriculture5210.6(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback