MD HB472 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a qualified farm a credit, for tax years 2017 through 2019, of up to $5,000 against the State income tax; providing that the credit is equal to 50% of the value of an eligible food donation or 75% of the value of donated certified organic produce; providing that the amount of tax credit certificates may not exceed $250,000 per year; requiring the Secretary of Agriculture, in consultation with the Comptroller, to report to the Governor and General Assembly on specified matters by January 1 of specified years; etc.
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-19) (Y: 118 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-19) (Y: 118 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233 |
2017-03-27 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (118-19) |
2017-02-24 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-24 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-23 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-27 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Anne Arundel County
Calvert County
Charles County
Comptroller
Food
Gifts
Income Tax
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Reports
Rules and Regulations
St. Mary's County
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Agriculture, Department of
Anne Arundel County
Calvert County
Charles County
Comptroller
Food
Gifts
Income Tax
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Reports
Rules and Regulations
St. Mary's County
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income