MD HB472 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to convene a workgroup to evaluate and make recommendations relating to lead liability protection for owners of pre-1978 rental property; requiring the Commissioner to report the findings and recommendations of the workgroup on or before December 1, 2012; etc.
Title
Workgroup on Lead Liability Protection for Rental Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 119 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 119 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2012-04-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments 247975/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-04-06 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-04-06 | Re-referred Finance | |
2012-03-29 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2012-04-05 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (123-13) | |
2012-04-05 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (119-19) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments 350516/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-13 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters) | |
2012-02-02 | First Reading Environmental Matters & Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Auditors and Audits
Bonds
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Counties
Environment, Department of
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Housing
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Investments
Landlord and Tenant
Liability
Minorities
Notices
Property Tax
Recordings
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
Telephones
Torts
Agents and Brokers
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Auditors and Audits
Bonds
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Counties
Environment, Department of
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Housing
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Investments
Landlord and Tenant
Liability
Minorities
Notices
Property Tax
Recordings
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
Telephones
Torts