MD HB470 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing, subject to specified requirements, dental hygienists to administer nitrous oxide to patients under the supervision of a dentist who is physically present on the premises and who has prescribed the administration of nitrous oxide; altering the definition of "practice dental hygiene"; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Administration of Nitrous Oxide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-07 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-03-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {416486/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Drugs
Education
Examinations
Health Occupations
Patients
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Drugs
Education
Examinations
Health Occupations
Patients