MD HB47 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the holder of an electronic nicotine delivery systems retailer license to make sales to consumers through the mail, a computer network, a telephonic network, or another electronic network; authorizing the holder of an electronic nicotine delivery systems wholesaler distributor license or an electronic nicotine delivery systems wholesaler importer license to sell electronic nicotine delivery systems to vape shop vendors; authorizing licensed vape shop vendors to make certain purchases from certain distributors; etc.
Title
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199 |
2018-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-02-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {493998/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-01-24 | House | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-11-06 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Dealers
Electronic Commerce
Emergency Bills
Licenses
Postal Service
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Tobacco
Commerce and Business
Dealers
Electronic Commerce
Emergency Bills
Licenses
Postal Service
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Tobacco