MD HB47 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to create a fact sheet on dental amalgam on or before January 1, 2015; requiring the fact sheet on dental amalgam to include specified information; requiring the Department to make a reasonable effort to distribute the dental amalgam fact sheet to the public; and requiring the Department to post the dental amalgam fact sheet on its Web site.
Title
Environment - Mercury - Dental Amalgam
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn |
2014-01-15 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-01-29 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-11-14 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Dentists
Electronic Government
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Health
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Public Information
Reports
Dentists
Electronic Government
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Health
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Public Information
Reports