MD HB468 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company to take specified actions relating to a subsidiary for specified purposes subject to specified requirements and under specified circumstances; altering the staggering of terms of members of the Board; authorizing the Governor to remove specified members for incompetence or misconduct; authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to remove specified members under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-18) (Y: 119 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-18) (Y: 119 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (119-18) |
2015-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {323795/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Accountants
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Governor
Insurance - Other than Health
Oaths
Prices
Public Employees
Reports
State Employees
Sunset
Workers' Compensation
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Governor
Insurance - Other than Health
Oaths
Prices
Public Employees
Reports
State Employees
Sunset
Workers' Compensation