MD HB465 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 216
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain persons that use a bot to publish, distribute, or disseminate campaign material online to another person in the State for the purpose of influencing an election to disclose in a clear and conspicuous manner on the campaign material that the person is using a bot to publish, distribute, or disseminate the campaign material; authorizing the State Board of Elections to seek to remove a bot under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Campaign Material - Disclosure of the Use of Bots

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 216
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Griffith) Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
2020-03-04SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-03HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2020-02-28HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-02-28HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2020-01-28HouseHearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-24HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law13401.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law13602(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law13604.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback