MD HB464 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB394

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that a referral to the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission is deemed approved under certain circumstances only if there is a complete submission or an explanatory narrative accompanied by architectural drawings that can be adequately reviewed by the Commission; requiring the Commission to notify a certain submitting entity within 3 business days regarding whether a certain submission or amendment to a submission is complete and accepted or rejected as incomplete; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland–National Capital Park and Planning Commission – Mandatory Referral Review MC/PG 101–21

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-10SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-04-10SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-24SenateHearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-22SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed (133-2)
2021-03-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-18HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-02-10HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-15HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

HB394 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Third Reading Passed (126-7)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Land Use20301(n/a)See Bill Text
Land Use20304(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback