MD HB463 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 215
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 215
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Defining the phrases "controlling interest" and "financial interest" as they apply to applications for alcoholic beverages licenses in Queen Anne's County; establishing that "controlling interest" refers to an applicant who has ownership or control of sufficient shares to allow for an exercise of control over the business and "financial interest" refers to an applicant who is the owner of a controlling interest in a place of business for which a license had been applied for or issued.
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Financial Interest
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 215 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {843692/1 Adopted |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-24 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Commerce and Business
Interest
Queen Anne's County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Commerce and Business
Interest
Queen Anne's County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 27 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 27 | 1401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 27 | 1404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 4 | 109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |