MD HB462 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB696
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each authorized prescriber who receives a financial gratuity or incentive from a pharmaceutical distributor or manufacturer to file a disclosure form with a certain health occupations board that licenses the authorized prescriber within 30 days after the financial gratuity or incentive is received by the authorized prescriber; and applying the Act prospectively
Title
Health Occupations - Authorized Prescribers - Reporting of Financial Gratuities or Incentives
Sponsors
Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] | Del. Heather Bagnall [D] | Del. Mary Lehman [D] | Del. Emily Shetty [D] |
Del. Jen Terrasa [D] | Sen. Karen Lewis Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB159 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
HB696 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
HB696 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Dentists
Discipline
Disclosure
Drugs
Fines
Gratuities
Health Occupations
Industry and Technology
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Medical Examiners
Nurses
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Podiatrists
Privacy
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Time
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Dentists
Discipline
Disclosure
Drugs
Fines
Gratuities
Health Occupations
Industry and Technology
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Medical Examiners
Nurses
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Podiatrists
Privacy
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 1 | 227 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0462?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0462f.pdf |