MD HB462 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 43-2-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 43-2-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the statutory minimum grant to Baltimore City, payable from the State's share of the proceeds of Program Open Space, for projects that meet park purposes and are related to Program Open Space; requiring the Governor to include in the budget bill for fiscal year 2018 a general fund appropriation in the amount of $5,000,000 to the Maryland Agricultural and Resource-Based Industry Development Corporation; reducing transfers from a specified special fund to the General Fund of the State for fiscal years 2017 and 2018; etc.
Title
Program Open Space - Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10 |
2016-03-31 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2016-03-31 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {449239/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2016-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Ghrist) {653221/1 Adopted |
2016-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {504968/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2016-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-29 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Agriculture
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Bonds
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Forests and Parks
General Services, Department of
Grants
Industry and Technology
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Planning, Department of
Program Open Space
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Works, Board of
Real Property
Reports
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Transfer Tax
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Bonds
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Forests and Parks
General Services, Department of
Grants
Industry and Technology
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Planning, Department of
Program Open Space
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Works, Board of
Real Property
Reports
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Transfer Tax