MD HB461 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Raising the salaries of part-time inspectors employed by the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County from $10,000 to $11,000 for one part-time chief inspector, from $8,000 to $9,000 for one part-time deputy chief inspector, and for other part-time inspectors from $6,000 to $7,000 annually.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Salaries of Inspectors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (45-1)
2020-03-16SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-16SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-04SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-03HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2020-02-28HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-28HouseFavorable with Amendments {683894/1 Adopted
2020-02-24HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-03HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-24HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-24HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB141 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages11102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages11206(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback