MD HB460 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain definition to provide that a Montgomery County fire and explosive investigator is an individual who is assigned full time to the Fire and Explosive Investigations Unit of the Montgomery County Fire and Rescue Service, rather than the Montgomery County Fire Marshal's Office.
Title
Montgomery County - Fire and Explosive Investigator - Definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2018-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {428272/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2018-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-25 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Criminal Law - Procedure
Explosives
Fire Protection
Investigations and Inquiries
Montgomery County
Public Safety
Explosives
Fire Protection
Investigations and Inquiries
Montgomery County
Public Safety