MD HB460 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, in Montgomery County, by October 1, 2020, a patrol vehicle used by a law enforcement officer who is a first responder or trained in cardiopulmonary resuscitation (CPR) and the operation and use of an automated external defibrillator (AED) to be equipped with an AED; providing that the Act does not apply to a vehicle being used by a law enforcement officer solely for transit purposes across or through Montgomery County; etc.
Title
Montgomery County - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Automated External Defibrillator MC 26-17
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2017-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-26 | House | First Reading Judiciary |