MD HB460 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the establishment of the Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program in one county and, on or after July 1, 2015, the program shall assist 50 couples; altering the provision of law relating to the number of couples to be assisted by the Program; repealing the eligibility requirement that an individual be an adult under the age of 36 years and substituting the requirement that a couple be raising together a child under the age of 14 years; and altering the termination date of the Program.
Title
Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program - Eligibility and Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (121-17) (Y: 121 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (121-17) (Y: 121 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (121-17) |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {364264/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2015-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-09 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Counties
Education
Human Resources, Department of
Minors
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Sunset
Welfare
Work, Labor and Employment
Education
Human Resources, Department of
Minors
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Sunset
Welfare
Work, Labor and Employment