MD HB46 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 39
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 39
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the Motor Vehicle Administration's authority to suspend the registration of a motor vehicle if the owner or driver of the motor vehicle fails to pay the penalty assessed for certain violations recorded by a traffic control signal monitoring system or a speed monitoring system.
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration – Authority to Suspend Registration for Violations Recorded by Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems and Speed Monitoring Systems – Repeal
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 39 |
2020-03-16 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments {480417/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-09 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-05-06 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB177 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 40
Subjects
Baltimore County
Citations
Crimes and Punishments
Electronic Surveillance
Fines
Highways
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Penalties and Sentences
Recordings
Registration
Safety
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Citations
Crimes and Punishments
Electronic Surveillance
Fines
Highways
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Penalties and Sentences
Recordings
Registration
Safety
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 202.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 801.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |