MD HB459 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Decreasing from $24 to $10 fees for certified copies of specified certificates; and decreasing from $20 to $10 the portion of each fee collected by local health departments required to be transferred to the General Fund.
Title
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee Reduction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-2) |
2016-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-19 | House | Special Order until 3/21 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {165263/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2016-01-29 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agriculture
Appropriations
Attorneys
Boats and Ships
Budgets
Business Regulation and Occupations
Chesapeake Bay
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Contractors
Counties
Energy Matters
Environment
Environmental Matters
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Forms
Fuel
Guns
Health
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Loans
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Corporations
Natural Resources
Power Plants
Public Safety
Public Service Commission
Records
Registration
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sales and Use Tax
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Vital Records
Waterway Improvement Fund
Weights and Measures
Wetlands
Agriculture
Appropriations
Attorneys
Boats and Ships
Budgets
Business Regulation and Occupations
Chesapeake Bay
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Contractors
Counties
Energy Matters
Environment
Environmental Matters
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Forms
Fuel
Guns
Health
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Loans
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Corporations
Natural Resources
Power Plants
Public Safety
Public Service Commission
Records
Registration
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sales and Use Tax
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Vital Records
Waterway Improvement Fund
Weights and Measures
Wetlands