MD HB458 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a homeowner of a certain home located in the State in the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area to ensure the home's on-site sewage disposal system utilizes or will be upgraded to utilize nitrogen removal technology before the home is sold or transferred.
Title
Environment – Sale or Transfer of Home With On–Site Sewage Disposal System – Nitrogen Removal Technology Requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2018-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-25 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |