MD HB457 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a certain termination provision for the purpose of continuing the exclusion of the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund from the list of insurance companies and other persons that are subject to a certain premium tax.
Title
Insurance - Application of Premium Tax - Continued Exclusion of Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 468 |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance Budget and Taxation |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2021-02-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2021-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {573691/1 Adopted |
2021-02-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-18 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB149 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 469
Subjects
Exemptions
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Insurance - Other than Health
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Revenue and Taxes
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Insurance - Other than Health
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Insurance | 6 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |