MD HB456 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the amount of the supplemental benefit that the State must provide under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program by increasing the minimum total monthly benefit from $30 to $40.
Title
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - State Supplement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324 |
2022-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (114-24) |
2022-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {903026/1 Adopted |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2022-01-27 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-20 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB957 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-14 - First Reading Senate Rules
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Human Services | 5 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |