MD HB456 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 713
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 713
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Education to develop a dispute resolution process to be used by families of children with disabilities and child care providers for resolving complaints of discrimination based on a child's disability; requiring the Department, in developing the dispute resolution process, to convene a workgroup that includes representatives of specified entities; requiring the Department to submit to the General Assembly, by October 1, 2017, a report outlining the process and its implementation; etc.
Title
Children With Disabilities and Child Care Providers - Dispute Resolution Process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-13) (Y: 126 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-13) (Y: 126 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 713 |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-13) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {275262/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-26 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Alternative Dispute Resolution
Child Care
Children
Disabilities
Discrimination
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Child Care
Children
Disabilities
Discrimination
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Rules and Regulations